THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:17:33 AM
Kassam, Hassanali Ali
CPSO#:
56011
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili
Education: University of Kerala, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hassanali Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 16 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Ajayjeet Grewal took over Dr. Kassam's practice and medical records. Patients may submit a medical record request to Dr. Grewal at: 402A - 18 Kensington Road, Brampton, ON, L6T 4S5. Telephone: (905) 791-9301.
Date Received: 16 Dec 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2022 |