THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 8:07:08 AM
Tyndall, Mark William
CPSO#:
56010
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Tyndall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 16 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2015 |