THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:29:59 AM
Szpejda, Monika Agnieszka
CPSO#:
56008
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Sep 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Monika Szpejda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Access Services Canada Inc. (RASCI)
Phone: 1-800-971-8038 ext. 702
Fax: 1-800-928-2503
Email: [email protected]
Website: www.rasci.ca
Date Received: 08 Jan 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2024 |