THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:18:57 PM
McCarthy, Anne Eileen
CPSO#:
55996
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Infectious Diseases
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave. Box 233
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19388
Fax: (613) 761-5260
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:01 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE EILEEN MCCARTHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCARTHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1988 |