THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:08:26 PM
Kemp, Sheelagh Margaret
CPSO#:
55955
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Suite 2212 D
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7453
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:22 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHEELAGH MARGARET KEMP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 1990 |