THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:52:32 AM
Robinson, Dale Keith
CPSO#:
55952
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
207-377 Church St
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 554-8711
Fax: (905) 554-8815
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALE KEITH ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2011 |