THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:23:36 AM
Woolner, Douglas Sidney
CPSO#:
55940
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Willett Woolner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy/transfer of their medical record can contact DocuDavit Solutions at: Telephone 1-888-781-9083, Fax 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 15 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 May 2021 |