THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:20:29 PM
Heseltine, Neville Geoffrey
CPSO#:
55901
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 May 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Geoffrey Heseltine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Date Received: 23 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Apr 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2022 |