THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:34:07 PM
Wong, John Wang-Ngai
CPSO#:
55869
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Wong, Wang Ngai (used until: 17 Jun 1986 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomic Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6106
Fax: (416) 480-4271
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN WANG-NGAI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1986 |