THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:36:29 AM
Docrat, Zohra
CPSO#:
55852
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
103 Darling Street
Brantford ON N3T 2Y3
Phone: 519-756-8228 Ext. 5803
Fax: 519-756-9092
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZOHRA DOCRAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCRAT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1987 |