THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:14:44 PM
Gverzdys, Sharunas Antanas
CPSO#:
55842
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
18 Dec 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Feb 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
18-Dec-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Lithuanian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. Gverzdys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 28 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1988 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 18 Dec 2017 |