THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:44:07 AM
Greenspoon, Mark Barry
CPSO#:
55835
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Greenspoon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2011
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite A
495 Dunsmuir Street
Nanaimo BC V9R 6B9
Date Received: 03 May 2017
Instructions/Address:Greenspoon Pain Management
Suite 110
164 Queen Street East
Brampton, ON L6V 1B4
Date Received: 08 Apr 2016
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Box 30029
1020 Kennedy Circle
Milton, Ontario
L9T 0L8
Date Received: 08 Jul 2010
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |