THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:38:41 PM
Sauret, Peter
CPSO#:
55829
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. P. Sauret Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS - Records Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 416-398-0638
Date Received: 13 Mar 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Apr 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 12, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Sauret to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 12, 2020:
Dr. Sauret has agreed to resign from the College effective April 10, 2020 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the date of his resignation.
Dr. Sauret will not treat any new patients or accept any new patients in his practice, effective immediately, and will not initiate any new treatment for his patients until he has consulted with his Clinical Supervisor.
Dr. Sauret will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until the date of his resignation.