THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:32:43 AM
Dickson, Dann William
CPSO#:
55821
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 751-5579
Fax: 519-751-5578
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:09 Sep 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANN WILLIAM DICKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DICKSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1988 |