THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:30:17 PM
Cole, Christopher Paul
CPSO#:
55804
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
21 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
21-May-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Christopher Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 12 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 21 May 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 18, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Christopher Paul Cole to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective July 18, 2017:
Dr. Cole no longer performs blepharoplasty.
Dr. Cole shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Cole no longer performs blepharoplasty.
Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".