THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:20:17 PM
Rubens, Fraser Douglas
CPSO#:
55799
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
Room H3401A
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7290
Fax: (613) 696-7303
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:01 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FRASER DOUGLAS RUBENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBENS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiothoracic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 7 - Cardiothoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1987 |