THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:19:25 AM
Rogers, James David
CPSO#:
55795
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
390 Brant Street
Burlington ON L7R 4J4
Phone: (905) 632-8162
Fax: (905) 632-9810
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:12 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES DAVID ROGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1986 |