THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 14:23:23 PM
Flood, Diane Alice
CPSO#:
55780
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 512
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 569-3883
Fax: (905) 569-2901
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:22 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DIANE ALICE FLOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1987 |