THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:23:19 AM
Grbac, Leonardo
CPSO#:
55779
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Grbac, Leonard (used until: 11 Feb 2010 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
18 Charleston Rd
Etobicoke ON M9B 4M7
Phone: 6476435384
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Grbac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:.
Patients looking for medical records from the Credit Valley Family Physicians After Hours Clinic can contact:
Dr. Leonardo Grbac
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 04 Jan 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEONARDO GRBAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRBAC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1986 |