THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:42:58 AM
Jain, Sanjive
CPSO#:
55776
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800-790 Bay St
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: 416 837 8181
Fax: 647 427 4928
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a written request to 201 King Street West; Oshawa, ON; L1J 2J5.
Date Received: 27 Jan 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANJIVE JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1986 |