THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:38:25 PM
Glass, David Hughes
CPSO#:
55731
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Mar 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Glass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Apr 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Hughes Glass to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 7, 2018:
Issues were identified with respect to Dr. Glass’s standard of practice. As a result, Dr. Glass will only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Glass shall practice only at Grey Bruce Health Services and South Bruce Grey Health Centre.
Download Full Document (PDF)