THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:14:18 PM
Goldfarb, David R
CPSO#:
55729
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
25 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Nov 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
25-Jun-2021
Former Name:
Goldfarb, David Ralph (used until: 17 Jun 1986 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Cynthia Goldfarb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:06 Sep 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 1987 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 25 Jun 2021 |