THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:26:01 AM
McRitchie, Donna Isabelle
CPSO#:
55725
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite #3SE-116
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6906
Fax: (416) 756-6909
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:12 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONNA ISABELLE MCRITCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCRITCHIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1987 |