THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:23:56 PM
Padonou, Michael Kweku
CPSO#:
55718
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jan 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
210-101 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
Phone: 9058968996
Fax: 9058968199
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KWEKU PADONOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADONOU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 1987 |