THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:26:11 AM
Pich, Bohdan Olexander
CPSO#:
55716
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
250 The East Mall
Cloverdale Mall
Suite 174B
Etobicoke ON M9B 3Y8
Phone: (416) 239-6122
Fax: (416) 239-4895
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Bohdan Pich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2008
Corporation Name: Dr. Bohdan Pich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BOHDAN OLEXANDER PICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2023 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 27, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)