THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:02:51 AM
Radzinski, Charles Aaron
CPSO#:
55713
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Dec 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2830 Keele Street
Suite 305
Toronto ON M3M 3E5
Phone: (416) 256-3117
Fax: (416) 256-9098
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
West Park Healthcare Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:20 Sep 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES AARON RADZINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADZINSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 1987 |