THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:47:58 AM
Potashner, Wayne Jeffrey
CPSO#:
55709
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
4430 Bathurst Street
Downsview ON M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 631-6090
Fax: (416) 631-6535
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:04 Dec 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WAYNE JEFFREY POTASHNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTASHNER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1986 |