THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:12:38 AM
Krensky, Robert
CPSO#:
55705
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46277
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Krensky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT KRENSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRENSKY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1989 |