THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:17:06 PM
Keshavjee, Shafique
CPSO#:
55704
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Room 9N 946
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4010
Fax: (416) 340-4556
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:12 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:01 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAFIQUE KESHAVJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESHAVJEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Mar 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1986 |