THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 23:06:44 PM
Hynscht, Harold Gunter
CPSO#:
55700
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dover Shores Family Practice
410 Main Street
Port Dover ON N0A 1N0
Phone: (519) 583-0892
Fax: (519) 583-3981
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAROLD GUNTER HYNSCHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYNSCHT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2021 |