THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:49:20 AM
Malthaner, Richard Adam
CPSO#:
55697
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Mar 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Mar 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Division Of Thoracic Surgery
E2 124
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6835
Fax: (519) 667 6517
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:01 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD ADAM MALTHANER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALTHANER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1992 |