THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:25:44 AM
Vinden, Christopher Martyn
CPSO#:
55681
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. M. Vinden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Command Services London Ltd.
100 Piccadilly St.
London, ON N6A 1R8
Date Received: 02 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:12 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 May 2022 |