THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 4:11:17 AM
Stefopulos, Thomas
CPSO#:
55672
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian, Macedonian
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 328-6143
Fax: (705) 328-6164
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stefopulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 6 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Thomas Stefopulos
29 Toronto Street
Uxbrige, Ontario
L9P 1V9
Date Received: 22 May 2008
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: January 13, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On February 2, 2015, Haliburton Highlands Health Services notified the College that Dr. Thomas Stefopulos's privileges were restricted, effective January 13, 2015.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THOMAS STEFOPULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEFOPULOS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 1986 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 10, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of February 08, 2019, Dr. Stefopulos has completed the requirements of his SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)