THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 12:43:17 PM
Touzel, Elizabeth Lyn
CPSO#:
55660
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Apr 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
310 Bridge Street West
Unit A Suite C01
Napanee ON K7R 0A4
Phone: (613) 354-2858
Fax: (613) 354-6495
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH LYN TOUZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUZEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Sep 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 1988 |