THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:43:41 PM
Ford, Peter Thomas
CPSO#:
55659
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
20 Nov 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Apr 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents seeking access to their medical records can contact Dr. Preshanthini Shanmugathasan (102193) at:
204 - 323 Wilson Rd E
Ancaster ON L9G 4A8
Tel: 905-304-8367
Date Received: 15 Nov 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2018 |