THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:59:35 AM
Faris, Matthew Weir
CPSO#:
55657
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dept of PM&R
Providence Care Hospital
752 King St. West
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 51718
Fax: (613) 544-4614
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:15 Sep 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW WEIR FARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1986 |