THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:07:52 AM
Murat, Brian Wellington
CPSO#:
55656
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 206
Huntsville ON P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-3900
Fax: (705) 990-2760
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: B.W. Murat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 28 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:20 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN WELLINGTON MURAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURAT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1986 |