THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:04:36 AM
Braden, Harold Phillips
CPSO#:
55649
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAROLD PHILLIPS BRADEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1986 |