THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:48:33 AM
Maybee, John Douglas
CPSO#:
55642
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 33312
Fax: (905) 721-4337
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS MAYBEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYBEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1986 |