THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:01:00 AM
Feibel, Robert John
CPSO#:
55638
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Mar 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
Suite 1652, Critical Care Wing
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 737 8849
Fax: 613 761 4572
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN FEIBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEIBEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 1990 |