THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:09:53 AM
Fletcher, Kenneth James
CPSO#:
55605
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1237 Donald Street
Ottawa ON K1J 8W3
Phone: (613) 695-9001
Fax: 6136958002
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KENNETH JAMES FLETCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLETCHER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 03 Aug 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: November 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 3, 2020, Dr. Fletcher has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)