THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:41:40 PM
McLean, Nicola Karin
CPSO#:
55582
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Nov 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Nov 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Brough, Nicola Karin (used until: 15 Sep 1985 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
South Huron Hospital
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 225-2035
Fax: (519) 225-2700
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:07 Sep 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLA KARIN MCLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLEAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1991 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Jan 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 1999 |