THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:12:30 AM
Townshend, Lois Ethel Myers
CPSO#:
55571
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Aug 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Myers Townshend, Lois Ethel (used until: 21 Jul 1986 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Associated Eye Surgeons
304 - 45 Resnik Rd.
Plymouth, MA 02360
United States
Tele: 508-747-4748
Fax: 508-747-0124
Date Received: 20 Jul 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:14 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2020 |