THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:12:44 AM
Jadd, Jerome Lawrence
CPSO#:
55560
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
469 William Street
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-0910
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEROME LAWRENCE JADD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JADD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1987 |