THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:52:00 PM
Hurlbut, David John
CPSO#:
55559
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology &
Molecular Medicine
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6035
Fax: (613) 548-1364
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:27 May 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN HURLBUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURLBUT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1988 |