THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:16:14 PM
Thompson, Guy William St. Maur
CPSO#:
55543
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Diabetic Foot Clinic
310 Wellington Road
London ON N6C 4P4
Phone: (519) 432-9468
Fax: (519) 432-6266
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:06 Sep 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GUY WILLIAM ST. MAUR THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2009 |