THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:48:45 PM
Beattie, Anne Maxine
CPSO#:
55538
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
304 Victoria Avenue North
Suite 503
Hamilton ON L8L 5G4
Phone: (905) 525-7907
Fax: (905) 525-9186
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:15 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNE MAXINE BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1987 |