THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 18:05:36 PM
Bilawski, Darlene Ann
CPSO#:
55527
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Schellert, Darlene Ann (used until: 28 Dec 1986 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3055 Trafalgar Street
London ON N6M 1H1
Phone: 15199022763
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Darlene Bilawski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARLENE ANN BILAWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILAWSKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1987 |