THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:52:31 PM
Yeats, Barbara Anna
CPSO#:
55524
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Sep 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Schumann, Barbara Anna (used until: 22 Dec 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON K4M 0V1
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARBARA ANNA YEATS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEATS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1986 |