THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:03:36 AM
Latimer, Bradley Robert
CPSO#:
55521
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dingwall Medical Group
40 Goodall St
Dryden ON P8N 1V8
Electoral District: 09
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: B.R. Latimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Appletree Medical Centre
225 Preston St, Ottawa, ON K1R 7R1
Date Received: 21 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1986 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 09 Jun 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jun 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jun 2022 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 29, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bradley Robert Latimer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 29, 2020:
Dr. Latimer is not permitted to prescribe the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:
Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)
Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)
Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)
Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)
All Other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotic Safety and Awareness Act, S.O. 2010, c. 22)
Dr. Latimer must post a sign in all of his waiting rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in any practice location, in a clearly visible and secure location. This sign shall state as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Latimer must not prescribe or administer any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- Monitored Drugs
Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca